This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2019 at 02:01:39 (UTC).

HARO, JOSUE VS SOUTH COAST AUTOMOTIVE LIQUIDA

Case Summary

On 02/11/2016 HARO, JOSUE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SOUTH COAST AUTOMOTIVE LIQUIDA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is AMY YERKEY. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1423

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

AMY YERKEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARO JOSUE

Defendant

SOUTH COAST AUTOMOTIVE LIQUIDATORS INC DBA GALAXY AUTO MALL

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

7/1/2016: Minute Order - (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

7/5/2016: Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 07/05/2016

7/5/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 07/05/2016

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

7/7/2016: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Other - (name extension) - STATEMENT OF DECISION

7/5/2016: Other - (name extension) - STATEMENT OF DECISION

Notice of Destruction of Exhibits and Depositions

2/21/2017: Notice of Destruction of Exhibits and Depositions

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2017
  • Notice of Destruction of Exhibits and Depositions; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • Other - STATEMENT OF DECISION; Filed by: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 07/05/2016; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • Court orders judgment after trial de novo entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by HARO, JOSUE on 02/11/2016 (from DOW16D01423): Defendant (SOUTH COAST AUTOMOTIVE LIQUIDATORS INC) DBA (GALAXY AUTO MALL) does not owe the plaintiff (HARO, JOSUE) any money on plaintiff's claim. Other: The Court writes a Statement of Decision, a copy of which is incorporated herein and mailed to each party. EXHIBITS TO CUSTODIAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • Updated -- On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by HARO, JOSUE on 02/11/2016 (from DOW16D01423), judgment entered on 04/28/2016 is vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by HARO, JOSUE on 02/11/2016 (from DOW16D01423), judgment entered on 04/28/2016 as to (SOUTH COAST AUTOMOTIVE LIQUIDATORS INC) is vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: (SOUTH COAST AUTOMOTIVE LIQUIDATORS INC) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2016
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED BY (SOUTH COAST AUTOMOTIVE LIQUIDATORS INC ) DBA (GALAXY AUTO MALL) . RECEIPT # DOW622969018 . MATTER SET FOR HEARING RE: SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL TRIAL DE NOVO ON 07/01/16 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. SE2 OF THE DOWNEY SUPERIOR COURT . CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF APPEAL AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL TRIAL DE NOVO FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES, AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (SOUTH COAST AUTOMOTIVE LIQUIDATORS INC ) DBA (GALAXY AUTO MALL) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • PROCEEDINGS ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED. INDEX NUMBER . .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (SOUTH COAST AUTOMOTIVE LIQUIDATORS INC ) DBA (GALAXY AUTO MALL) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 002 , HON. AMY YERKEY PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING IN PRO PER . DEFENDANT APPEARING BY MICHAEL RUDDLE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 04/28/16 . FOR (HARO, JOSUE) . AGAINST (SOUTH COAST AUTOMOTIVE LIQUIDATORS INC ) DBA (GALAXY AUTO MALL) . PRINCIPAL $ 8713.39 . COSTS $ 90.00 . TOTAL $ 8803.39 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AS TO (SOUTH COAST AUTOMOTIVE LIQUIDATORS INC ) DBA (GALAXY AUTO MALL) FILED BY THE SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 04/28/16 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPARTMENT SE2 . SERVICE COSTS: $ 40.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN DOW402835005. HEARING SET FOR 04/28/16 AT 01:30 PM IN DPT. SE2.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO SE2 RE: SCFD .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTH COAST AUTOMOTIVE LIQUIDATORS INC is a litigant