This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2021 at 05:13:33 (UTC).

HARCO NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION VS AMBER NAGLE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/01/2019 HARCO NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against AMBER NAGLE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4259

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARCO NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY A CORPORATION

Defendants

NAGLE AMBER

EVANGELISTA DAPHNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAINES TODD F.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

9/16/2021: Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

10/12/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort - Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort

5/18/2021: Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort - Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort

Witness List - Witness List

7/21/2021: Witness List - Witness List

Exhibit List - Exhibit List

7/21/2021: Exhibit List - Exhibit List

Minute Order - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

7/28/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 07/28/2021

7/28/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 07/28/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

7/28/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial;) of 07/28/2021

7/28/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial;) of 07/28/2021

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

9/3/2020: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings - Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

9/21/2020: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings - Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration in Support of CCP 1033

4/22/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration in Support of CCP 1033

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

4/22/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/22/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration in Support of Interest Memo

4/22/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration in Support of Interest Memo

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration in Support of Default Judgment - Insured

4/22/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration in Support of Default Judgment - Insured

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration in Support of Default Judgment - Plaintiff

4/22/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration in Support of Default Judgment - Plaintiff

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

4/29/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2021
  • Hearing12/16/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: (name extension)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Order to Show Cause Re: Status of Settlement/Dismissal as to Daphne Evangelista and Entry of Default Judgment as to Amber Nagle or Dismissal scheduled for 11/15/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 12/16/2021 09:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 11/15/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 11/15/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 09/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: Harco National Insurance Company, a corporation (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No; Settlement Type: Unconditional; Set Hearing and Generate Notice?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Status of Settlement/Dismissal as to Daphne Evangelista and Entry of Default Judgment as to Amber Nagle or Dismissal scheduled for 11/15/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial;) of 07/28/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Daphne Evangelista (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Harco National Insurance Company, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Amber Nagle (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 05/21/2019; Service Cost: 74.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/28/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Harco National Insurance Company, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Amber Nagle (Defendant); Daphne Evangelista (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Harco National Insurance Company, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Amber Nagle (Defendant); Daphne Evangelista (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Harco National Insurance Company, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Amber Nagle (Defendant); Daphne Evangelista (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC04259    Hearing Date: September 03, 2020    Dept: 26

MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES; DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION ADMITTED

(CCP §§ 2030.290; 2033.280)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff Harco National Insurance Company’s (1) Motion to Compel Responses to Form Interrogatories, Set One and Request for Sanctions; and (2) Motion to Deem the Truth of Matters in Request for Admissions as Admitted and Request for Sanctions are GRANTED. RESPONSES TO THE INTERROGATORIES ARE TO BE SERVED BY DEFENDANT DAPHNE EVANGELISTA WITHIN 20 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER. DEFENDANT EVANGELISTA IS FURTHER ORDERED TO PAY SANCTIONS OF $570.00 TO PLAINTIFF’S COUNSEL WITHIN 30 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER.

ANALYSIS:

Plaintiff Harco National Insurance Company (“Plaintiff”) filed the instant action for breach of contract against Defendants Amber Nagle (“Defendant Nagle”) and Daphne Evangelista (“Defendant Evangelista”) on May 1, 2019. Plaintiff served Form Interrogatories, Set One and Request for Admissions on Defendant Evangelista on August 17, 2019. (Motions, Tapper Decl., Exh. A.) Plaintiff now brings the instant (1) Motion to Compel Responses to Form Interrogatories, Set One and Request for Sanctions; and (2) Motion to Deem the Truth of Matters in Request for Admissions as Admitted and Request for Sanctions (the “Motions”). To date, no opposition has been filed.

Due to the failure to respond to the propounded discovery requests, Defendant Evangelista is ordered to serve verified responses, without objections, to Plaintiff’s Form Interrogatories, Set One within twenty (20) days from the date of Plaintiff serving notice of this Order. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2030.290.) The Requests for Admission are also deemed admitted against Defendant Evangelista. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2033.280.)

The Court finds Defendant Evangelista’s failure to respond an abuse of the discovery process. Monetary sanctions are awarded under Code of Civil Procedure sections 2033.280, 2030.290 and 2023.010. Given the simplicity of the Motions, the Court finds that total sanctions are appropriate in the amount of $570.00 based on two hours of attorney time billed at $225.00 per hour and two filing fees of $60.00 each. (Motions, Tapper Decl., ¶4.) Sanctions are to be paid within thirty (30) days from the date of Plaintiff serving notice of this Order.

Conclusion

Plaintiff Harco National Insurance Company’s (1) Motion to Compel Responses to Form Interrogatories, Set One and Request for Sanctions; and (2) Motion to Deem the Truth of Matters in Request for Admissions as Admitted and Request for Sanctions are GRANTED. RESPONSES TO THE INTERROGATORIES ARE TO BE SERVED BY DEFENDANT DAPHNE EVANGELISTA WITHIN 20 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER. DEFENDANT EVANGELISTA IS FURTHER ORDERED TO PAY SANCTIONS OF $570.00 TO PLAINTIFF’S COUNSEL WITHIN 30 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER.

Moving party to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARCO NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant