This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/30/2019 at 09:45:56 (UTC).

HARBOR FURNITURE MANUFACTURING VS BERNAL, LUIS

Case Summary

On 12/29/2014 HARBOR FURNITURE MANUFACTURING filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BERNAL, LUIS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NICOLE HEESEMAN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2171

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

NICOLE HEESEMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARBOR FURNITURE MANUFACTURING INC.

Defendant

BERNAL LUIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICE - LARRY W. WEAVER ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICE

WEAVER LARRY W. ESQ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2015
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # PRD . MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 61.67 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • STIPULATION FOR COMMISSIONER TO ACT AS TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • MINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. S12 , HON. COMM NICOLE HEESEMAN PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. PLAINTIFF(S) APPEARING LARRY WEAVER (X) . DEFENDANT(S) FAILING TO APPEAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 02/24/15 , FOR (HARBOR FURNITURE MANUFACTURING, INC.) , AGAINST (BERNAL, LUIS) , PAST DUE RENT + DAILY DAMAGES $ 7153.62 , ATTORNEY FEES $ 500.00 , COSTS $ 374.64 . TOTAL $ 8,028.26 , AND FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES LOCATED AT 7101 E. ROSECRANS AVENUE, SPACE NO. 175 PARAMOUNT, CA 90723 , AND THIS JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS OF THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • MINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. S12 , HON. COMM NICOLE HEESEMAN PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. PLAINTIFF(S) APPEARING LARRY WEAVER (X) . DEFENDANT(S) FAILING TO APPEAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP; DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED AS TO (BERNAL, LUIS) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • MATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL ON 02/24/15 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. S12 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2015
  • ANSWER FILED OF (BERNAL, LUIS) . RECEIPT # WAIVER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2015
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY (BERNAL, LUIS) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2015
  • ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES SIGNED AND FILED AS TO (BERNAL, LUIS) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2015
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2014
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN LB459233003. Filing Fee: 240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2014
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2014
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2014
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 06/29/15 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. S12 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARBOR FURNITURE MANUFACTURING INC is a litigant