Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/29/2020 at 04:31:19 (UTC).

HARBOR FURNITURE MANUFACTURING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS MONICA BARRERA

Case Summary

On 11/19/2019 HARBOR FURNITURE MANUFACTURING, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MONICA BARRERA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VICTOR M. ACEVEDO. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2123

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

VICTOR M. ACEVEDO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARBOR FURNITURE MANUFACTURING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA THE CALIFORNIAN ESTATES

Defendants

BARRERA MONICA AKA MARY ANN MONICA BARRERA

MENCHACA JESUS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WEAVER LARRY WAYNE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/19/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/19/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/19/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

11/19/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Jesus Menchaca)

11/21/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Jesus Menchaca)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Monica Barrera)

11/21/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Monica Barrera)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

11/21/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/26/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/26/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

11/26/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

RETURNED MAIL - RETURNED MAIL

12/2/2019: RETURNED MAIL - RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL - RETURNED MAIL

12/2/2019: RETURNED MAIL - RETURNED MAIL

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/4/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/17/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale - Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale

12/18/2019: Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale - Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale

Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice of Entry of Judgment

12/18/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice of Entry of Judgment

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution

12/19/2019: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution

Writ - Return - Writ - Return

1/10/2020: Writ - Return - Writ - Return

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution: Filed By: Harbor Furniture Manufacturing, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 01/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Wholly Satisfied);; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: Yes; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution; Issued by: Harbor Furniture Manufacturing, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Monica Barrera (Defendant); Jesus Menchaca (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketNotice Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by: Harbor Furniture Manufacturing, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Monica Barrera (Defendant); Jesus Menchaca (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Entry of Judgment: Name Extension changed from Notice of Entry of Judgment to of Entry of Judgment; As To Parties changed from Jesus Menchaca (Defendant), Monica Barrera (Defendant) to Monica Barrera (Defendant), Jesus Menchaca (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale; Filed by: Harbor Furniture Manufacturing, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/29/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Harbor Furniture Manufacturing, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; Jesus Menchaca (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketJudgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Harbor Furniture Manufacturing, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketDefault entered as to Jesus Menchaca; unnamed occupants pursuant to CCP 415.46; On the Complaint filed by Harbor Furniture Manufacturing, Inc., a California Corporation on 11/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Harbor Furniture Manufacturing, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Jesus Menchaca (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/25/2019; Service Cost: 67.35; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 11/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Harbor Furniture Manufacturing, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Monica Barrera (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/29/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Victor M. Acevedo in Department 7 Compton Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Harbor Furniture Manufacturing, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Monica Barrera (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: Status Date changed from 11/20/2019 to 11/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Harbor Furniture Manufacturing, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Monica Barrera (Defendant); Jesus Menchaca (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARBOR FURNITURE MANUFACTURING INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEAVER LARRY WAYNE