This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/28/2019 at 01:33:48 (UTC).

HARALAMBOS, HARALAMBOS T VS BERBERJAN, RAFFIE GREG

Case Summary

On 07/31/2015 HARALAMBOS, HARALAMBOS T filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BERBERJAN, RAFFIE GREG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9361

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARALAMBOS HARALAMBOS

Defendants

BERBERJAN RAFFIE GREG

HELOU & SONS CORP

HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY

BERBERIAN DESIGN & CABINETS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF SCOTT J EHERRIEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2016
  • DocketHEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - FILED & ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - FILED & ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - FILED & ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • DocketA/C - COMPLAINT FILED REASON: OTHERS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • Docket1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • DocketSUMMON ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • DocketNON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 01/31/17, 08:30 AM, DEPT 77 * * DELETED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • DocketOSC SET 07/31/18, 08:30 AM, DEPT. 77 PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER * * DELETED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - BREACH OF CONTRACT Filing Fee: 370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less