This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/09/2020 at 19:42:32 (UTC).

HANNAH SPATES VS ROBIN PETER EISNER

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 HANNAH SPATES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ROBIN PETER EISNER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5077

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPATES HANNAH

Defendant

EISNER ROBIN PETER

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

1/17/2020: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/17/2020

1/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/17/2020

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

12/6/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

1/17/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

1/9/2020: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2020
  • Hearing03/12/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 300 East Walnut St., Pasadena, CA 91101; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/12/2020 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/17/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/17/2020 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion was rescheduled to 03/12/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketRequest to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Hannah Spates (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Hannah Spates (Plaintiff); As to: Robin Peter Eisner (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase assigned in Department A Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/17/2020 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less