Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2018 at 05:40:23 (UTC).

HANG CAM VS ISSA SOUCCAR

Case Summary

On 05/16/2017 HANG CAM filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ISSA SOUCCAR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5129

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downey Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAM HANG

Hawthorne, CA 90250

Defendant

SOUCCAR ISSA

San Tan Valley, AZ 85143

 

Court Documents

Unknown

3/26/2018: Unknown

Unknown

5/21/2018: Unknown

EXHIBIT RECEIPT

1/12/2018: EXHIBIT RECEIPT

Unknown

1/9/2018: Unknown

Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 01/09/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

1/9/2018: Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 01/09/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

(Ruling on Submitted Matter)

1/9/2018: (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Unknown

12/28/2017: Unknown

(Non-Jury Trial)

1/2/2018: (Non-Jury Trial)

(Non-Jury Trial)

10/18/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

(Non-Jury Trial)

8/10/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

5/16/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

5/16/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

5/16/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2018
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: Hang Cam (Plaintiff); As to: Issa Souccar (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 05/21/2018 ; Status Date changed from 01/09/2018 to 05/21/2018 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • Other - EXHIBIT RECEIPT; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 01/09/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Hang Cam against Defendant Issa Souccar on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Hang Cam on 05/16/2017 for the principal amount of $2,046.43 and costs of $50.00 for a total of $2,096.43.; This judgment results from a motor vehicle accident on a California highway and was caused by the judgment debtor's operation of a motor vehicle. If the judgment is not paid, the judgment creditor may apply to have the judgment debtor's drivers license suspended.; Other: JUDGMENT BREAKDOWN: $1,926.43 REPAIR COST PLUS $120.00 LOSS OF USE. EXHIBITS TO CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/02/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 01/02/2018; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • Pursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/10/2017 at 01:30 PM in at Department SE2 Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion to 10/18/2017 01:30 PM at 10/18/2017 1:30 PM Non-Jury Trial in Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/18/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: 1170523E0513 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170523E0513 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce at Downey Courthouse in Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/10/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Hang Cam (Plaintiff); As to: Issa Souccar (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less