This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/12/2022 at 06:08:11 (UTC).

HAKIMI BERKE VS CHRISTINA HARRIS

Case Summary

On 02/06/2020 HAKIMI BERKE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CHRISTINA HARRIS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1283

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

. BERKEHAKIMI

Defendant

HARRIS CHRISTINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAKIMI HELGA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/6/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

2/6/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/6/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/6/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

2/6/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Answer - Answer

4/1/2020: Answer - Answer

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

4/1/2020: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Answer - Answer

3/30/2020: Answer - Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/17/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

8/5/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/05/2021

8/5/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/05/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by BerkeHakimi . on 02/06/2020, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action, pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure Section 581(b)(3)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/05/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/05/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 08/05/2021; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/04/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Christina Harris (Defendant); As to: BerkeHakimi . (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Christina Harris (Defendant); As to: BerkeHakimi . (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Christina Harris (Defendant); As to: BerkeHakimi . (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: BerkeHakimi . (Plaintiff); As to: Christina Harris (Defendant); Service Cost: 79.41; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/05/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: BerkeHakimi . (Plaintiff); As to: Christina Harris (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: BerkeHakimi . (Plaintiff); As to: Christina Harris (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: BerkeHakimi . (Plaintiff); As to: Christina Harris (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less