This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/18/2020 at 00:02:42 (UTC).

HAKIM ALLAH VS STEVEN ADAMS

Case Summary

On 06/19/2019 HAKIM ALLAH filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STEVEN ADAMS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5818

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALLAH HAKIM

BAILEY MELDRAN

Defendant

ADAMS STEVEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHEKARCHIAN HALEH

 

Court Documents

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF HALEH SHEKARCHIAN IN SUPPORT OF TAKING OFF CALENDAR THE MINOR'S COMPROMISE HEARING

1/28/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF HALEH SHEKARCHIAN IN SUPPORT OF TAKING OFF CALENDAR THE MINOR'S COMPROMISE HEARING

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise)

2/6/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise)]

2/6/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise)]

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

7/6/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

12/11/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF HALEH SWHEKARCHIAN IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR MINOR'S COMPROMISE

9/6/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF HALEH SWHEKARCHIAN IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR MINOR'S COMPROMISE

Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing - Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing for Guardian ad litem re: Hakim

8/28/2019: Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing - Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing for Guardian ad litem re: Hakim

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

8/13/2019: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim - Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

8/13/2019: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim - Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

7/22/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

6/19/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Complaint - Complaint

6/19/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/19/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/19/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/16/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/22/2022 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketAddress for HALEH SHEKARCHIAN (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by HAKIM ALLAH on 06/19/2019, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by HAKIM ALLAH and Meldran Bailey as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise)]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketHearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise scheduled for 02/06/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 02/06/2020; Result Type to Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketDeclaration OF HALEH SHEKARCHIAN IN SUPPORT OF TAKING OFF CALENDAR THE MINOR'S COMPROMISE HEARING; Filed by: HAKIM ALLAH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise scheduled for 12/12/2019 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 02/06/2020 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Meldran Bailey (Plaintiff): First Name changed from Meldron to Meldran

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: HAKIM ALLAH (Plaintiff); As to: steven adams (Defendant); Type: Fictitious Name

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name): As To Parties changed from steven adams (Defendant) to steven adams (Defendant); Status changed from Filed to Signed and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/16/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: HALEH SHEKARCHIAN (Attorney); HAKIM ALLAH (Plaintiff); As to: steven adams (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: HALEH SHEKARCHIAN (Attorney); HAKIM ALLAH (Plaintiff); As to: steven adams (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC05818    Hearing Date: February 06, 2020    Dept: 94

PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION

(Prob. Code §§ 3500, 3600, et seq.; CCP § 372)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Petition of Meldran Elihu Bailey to Approve Minor’s Compromise of Claim on behalf of minor Claimant Hakim Allah is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

ANALYSIS:

On June 19, 2019, minor Plaintiff Hakim Allah (“Claimant”), purportedly through his guardian ad litem Meldran Elihu Bailey (“Petitioner”) filed the instant action for motor vehicle negligence against Defendant Steven Adams (“Defendant”). Petitioner filed the instant Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim on Behalf of a Minor (the “Petition”) on August 13, 2019.

On January 28, 2020, Claimant’s counsel filed a Declaration, requesting that the hearing on this Petition be placed off calendar due to Claimant’s guardian’s refusal to appear at the hearing.

Accordingly, the Petition is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.