This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/25/2019 at 01:24:58 (UTC).

GUTTMAN FAMILY PARTNERSHIP VS DZHERIEV, SOSLANBEK

Case Summary

On 09/09/2015 GUTTMAN FAMILY PARTNERSHIP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DZHERIEV, SOSLANBEK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0989

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUTTMAN FAMILY PARTNERSHIP

Defendants

DZHERIEV SOSLANBEK

DZHERIEVA YELENA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KING, ALLEN R

KING ALLEN R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2015
  • WRIT RETURN ISSUED ON : 10/09/15 IS FULLY SATISFIED FROM LOS ANGELES WRIT RETURN ISSUED ON : 10/09/15 IS FULLY SATISFIED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY (LOS ANGELES) WITH UNCOLLECTED COSTS OF $145.00 AS OF 11/04/15.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED-RETURNED BY MAIL/VKB WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED-RETURNED BY MAIL/VKB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT FILED APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • HEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • JUDGMENT AS TO UNNAMED TENANTS CCP 415.46 ENTERED. JUDGMENT AS TO UNNAMED TENANTS CCP 415.46 ENTERED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • 415.46 DEFAULT PACKAGE RECEIVED 415.46 DEFAULT PACKAGE RECEIVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE AS TO UNNAMED TENANTS FILED. PROOF OF SERVICE AS TO UNNAMED TENANTS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • DEFAULT AS TO UNNAMED TENANTS ENTERED DEFAULT AS TO UNNAMED TENANTS ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT ONLY PENDING *** DEFAULT PROCESSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • OSC SET 03/07/16, 08:30 AM, DEPT. CLK PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER * * DELETED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • COMPLAINT FILED - U.D. RESIDENTIAL Filing Fee: 240.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • SUMMONS FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less