This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/12/2019 at 15:33:27 (UTC).

GUTTMAN FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP VS KUZMENKO, IGOR

Case Summary

On 09/12/2012 GUTTMAN FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against KUZMENKO, IGOR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1856

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUTTMAN FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Defendant

KUZMENKO IGOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANDELBAUM & ROBISON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2012
  • WRIT RETURNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2012
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2012
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED; RETURNED VIA ATTY SER/OR WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED; RETURNED VIA ATTY SER/OR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2012
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2012
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED-20 MIN(S) * * REJECTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2012
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2012
  • MEMO TO SET REJECTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2012
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING *** DEFAULT PROCESSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2012
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED Filing Fee: 240.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2012
  • SUMMONS FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less