This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/26/2020 at 08:53:52 (UTC).

GURDEEP SETHI VS ROY MEDICAL GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 07/24/2019 GURDEEP SETHI filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against ROY MEDICAL GROUP, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3237

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SETHI GURDEEP

Defendant

ROY MEDICAL GROUP INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WEGNER STEVEN GAIRD

 

Court Documents

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

9/17/2019: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/24/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Request For Entry of Judgment (Enforcement of Judgment) - Request For Entry of Judgment (Enforcement of Judgment)

7/24/2019: Request For Entry of Judgment (Enforcement of Judgment) - Request For Entry of Judgment (Enforcement of Judgment)

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

7/24/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: Gurdeep Sethi (Plaintiff); As to: Roy Medical Group, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketCase assigned in ROOM 118 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Gurdeep Sethi (Plaintiff); As to: Roy Medical Group, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketRequest For Entry of Judgment (Enforcement of Judgment); Filed by: Gurdeep Sethi (Plaintiff); As to: Roy Medical Group, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Gurdeep Sethi against Defendant Roy Medical Group, Inc., a California Corporation on the Petition filed by Gurdeep Sethi on 07/24/2019 for the principal amount of $17,644.40, interest of $339.54, and costs of $395.00 for a total of $18,378.94.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROY MEDICAL GROUP INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEGNER STEVEN GAIRD