This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/19/2021 at 08:05:00 (UTC).

GUO QIANG HE VS ANAYA LANAE WILLIAMS

Case Summary

On 10/16/2020 GUO QIANG HE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ANAYA LANAE WILLIAMS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8810

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HE GUO QIANG

Defendant

WILLIAMS ANAYA LANAE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PONCE MICHAEL J.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/21/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

2/1/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/16/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

10/16/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/16/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/16/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

10/16/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Guo Qiang He on 10/16/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Guo Qiang He as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketAddress for Michael J. Ponce (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Guo Qiang He (Plaintiff); As to: Anaya Lanae Williams (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/21/2020; Service Cost: 100.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Guo Qiang He (Plaintiff); As to: Anaya Lanae Williams (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Guo Qiang He (Plaintiff); As to: Anaya Lanae Williams (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Guo Qiang He (Plaintiff); As to: Anaya Lanae Williams (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PONCE MICHAEL