This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/06/2020 at 18:04:59 (UTC).

GUARDIAN NATIONAL, INC. VS SHANGRI-LA CONSTRUCTION, LP

Case Summary

On 05/22/2018 GUARDIAN NATIONAL, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SHANGRI-LA CONSTRUCTION, LP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7387

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUARDIAN NATIONAL INC. DBA GUARDIAN NATIONAL SECURITY

Defendant

SHANGRI-LA CONSTRUCTION LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIEGEL EDWIN BARTON

 

Court Documents

Writ - Return - Writ - Return

3/20/2020: Writ - Return - Writ - Return

Writ - Return - Writ - Return

4/28/2020: Writ - Return - Writ - Return

Writ - Return - Writ - Return

5/22/2019: Writ - Return - Writ - Return

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/19/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution ( Los Angeles)

5/23/2019: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution ( Los Angeles)

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)

12/5/2018: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)

Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment - Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

10/23/2018: Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment - Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

8/24/2018: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Judgment

8/24/2018: Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - re: interest

8/24/2018: Declaration (name extension) - re: interest

Declaration (name extension) - re: attorney's fees

8/24/2018: Declaration (name extension) - re: attorney's fees

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/3/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/22/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/22/2018: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/22/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (Correction) Los Angeles: Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 04/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Unsatisfied);; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution ( Los Angeles): Filed By: Guardian National, Inc. (Plaintiff); Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 03/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Unsatisfied);; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution ( Los Angeles); Issued by: Guardian National, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Shangri-La Construction, LP (Defendant); County: Los Angeles

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketWrit - Return ( ); Guardian National, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Shangri-La Construction, LP (Defendant); Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (Correction) Los Angeles: Exact Name: Writ of Execution (Correction) Los Angeles; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Guardian National, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Shangri-La Construction, LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Clerk; County: Los Angeles

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (Los Angeles): Status Date changed from 12/28/2018 to 12/05/2018; As To Parties changed from Shangri-La Construction, LP (Defendant) to Shangri-La Construction, LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketDefault entered as to Shangri-La Construction, LP; On the Complaint filed by Guardian National, Inc. on 05/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Guardian National, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Shangri-La Construction, LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Guardian National, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Shangri-La Construction, LP (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 06/06/2018; Service Cost: 48.63; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Georgina T. Rizk in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/19/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/25/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Guardian National, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Guardian National, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Shangri-La Construction, LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GUARDIAN NATIONAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SHANGRI-LA CONSTRUCTION L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIEGEL EDWIN B.