This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/16/2019 at 20:45:36 (UTC).

GUADALUPE CALDERON ZAMBRANO VS MIGUEL LARIOS LOPEZ

Case Summary

On 03/20/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by GUADALUPE CALDERON ZAMBRANO against MIGUEL LARIOS LOPEZ in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4336

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZAMBRANO GUADALUPE CALDERON

Defendant

LOPEZ MIGUEL LARIOS

 

Court Documents

Answer - Answer to Complaint

3/27/2019: Answer - Answer to Complaint

Complaint

3/20/2018: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/20/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - on Complaint

3/20/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/20/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2021
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 09/05/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 09/05/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketMotion to Compel NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIF GUADALUPE CALDERON ZAMBRANO TO RESPOND TO DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,640.00 AGAINST PLAINTIFF AND HIS COUNSEL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; Filed by: Miguel Larios Lopez (Defendant); As to: Guadalupe Calderon Zambrano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketMotion to Compel NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND TO FORM INTERROGATORIES; REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,640.00 AGAINST PLAINTIFF AND HIS COUNSEL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF ARNOLD J. ALBAN; Filed by: Miguel Larios Lopez (Defendant); As to: Guadalupe Calderon Zambrano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint; Filed by: Miguel Larios Lopez (Defendant); As to: Guadalupe Calderon Zambrano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 94 - Hon. James E. Blancarte; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Guadalupe Calderon Zambrano (Plaintiff); As to: Miguel Larios Lopez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Guadalupe Calderon Zambrano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/17/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/23/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 18STLC04336    Hearing Date: October 31, 2019    Dept: 94

MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES, REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

(CCP §§ 2030.290; 2031.300)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendant Miguel Larios Lopez’s (1) Motion for Order Compelling Plaintiff Guadalupe Calderon Zambrano to Respond to Form Interrogatories; Request for Sanctions; and (2) Motion for Order Compelling Plaintiff Guadalupe Calderon Zambrano to Respond to Request for Production of Documents; Request for Sanctions are GRANTED. RESPONSES TO THE INTERROGATORIES AND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION ARE TO BE SERVED BY PLAINTIFF WITHIN 20 DAYS OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF THIS ORDER. PLAINTIFF IS FURTHER ORDERED TO PAY SANCTIONS OF $518.30 TO DEFENSE COUNSEL WITHIN 30 DAYS OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF THIS ORDER.

SUMMARY OF COMPLAINT: Action for motor vehicle negligence.

GROUNDS FOR MOTION: The Court should compel Plaintiff to provide verified responses to the interrogatories and document demands, without objections. (Code Civ. Proc., §§ 2030.290; 2031.300.) Also, the Court should sanction Plaintiff and his counsel for failing to serve responses to said discovery. Sanctions are sought in the amount of $1,640.00 per motion. [Counsel charges $395.00 per hour].

OPPOSITION: None filed as of October 28, 2019.

ANALYSIS:

Defendant Miguel Larios Lopez’s (1) Motion For Order Compelling Plaintiff Guadalupe Calderon Zambrano To Respond to Form Interrogatories; Request for Sanctions; and (2) Motion For Order Compelling Plaintiff Guadalupe Calderon Zambrano to Respond to Request for Production of Documents; Request For Sanctions, are GRANTED.

On March 25, 2019, Defendant served Form Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents on Plaintiff. (Motion, Alban Decl. ¶1, Exh. A.) To date, Defendant has not received any verified responses to the propounded discovery requests from Plaintiff. (Id. ¶2.)

Due to the failure to respond to the propounded discovery requests, Plaintiff is ordered to serve verified responses, without objections, to Defendant’s Form Interrogatories and Request for Production within twenty (20) days from the date of Defendant serving a notice of this Order. (See Code Civ. Proc., §§ 2030.290; 2031.300.) Monetary sanctions are also awarded under Code of Civil Procedure sections 2030.290 and 2031.300. Given the simplicity of the Motions and the lack of opposition and reply, the Court finds that sanctions are appropriate in the amount of $518.30 based on one hour of attorney time billed at $395.00 per hour, plus two filing fees of $61.65 each. (Motions, Alban Decl., ¶3.) Sanctions are to be paid within thirty (30) days from the date of Defendant serving notice of this Order.

Moving party to give notice.