This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/23/2017 at 06:05:30 (UTC).

GROUP II AZUSA PROPERTIES, LTD VS. ALLEN, LAVINCIA

Case Summary

On 05/09/2017 GROUP II AZUSA PROPERTIES, LTD filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ALLEN, LAVINCIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDOLPH A. ROGERS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0733

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RANDOLPH A. ROGERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GROUP II AZUSA PROPERTIES LTD

Defendant

ALLEN LAVINCIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES - HELEN GRAYCE LONG ESQ

Attorney at H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2017
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # PD . US MAIL ( FES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY CLERK FOR DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO (ALLEN, LAVINCIA) ON 06/01/17 FILED. DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ .00 , AND DECLARATON OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 06/06/17 , FOR (GROUP II AZUSA PROPERTIES, LTD) , AGAINST (ALLEN, LAVINCIA) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 311 W LANCASTER BLVD APT 16 LANCASTER, CA 93534 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF OSC AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT, NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FILED. SERVED AS TO (ALLEN, LAVINCIA) . COSTS OF $ 75.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (ALLEN, LAVINCIA) AND ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN 04.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. A15 , HONORABLE RANDOLPH A. ROGERS .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • MATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON 11/07/17 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPARTMENT A15 . .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GROUP II AZUSA PROPERTIES LTD is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICE OF JOHN BOUZANE - HELEN GRAYCE LONG ESQ