This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/14/2016 at 06:34:56 (UTC).

GREEN, AC JR. VS. CWMBS, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/16/2012 GREEN, AC JR filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CWMBS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HERBERT DODELL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1924

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HERBERT DODELL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GREEN AC JR.

Defendants

CWMBS INC. DEPOSITOR

BANK OF AMERICA N.A. LOAN SERVICER

THE BANK OF NEW YORK TRUSTEE

RECONTRUST COMPANY N.A. TRUSTEE MA

MERS-MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEM

CHL MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH TRUST 2006 TM1 ISSUER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2014
  • DocketCASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • DocketPURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 03/19/14 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • Docket* EFFECTIVE 05/28/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • Docket* CASE REASSIGNED TO THE INGLEWOOD COURTHOUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • Docket* CASE RENUMBERED FROM SBA12S01924 TO ING12ST1924

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2013
  • DocketCASE FILE STORED IN BOX #53 SET FOR DESTRUCTION ON 03/07/14 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. DES .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2012
  • DocketRECEIVED THE SUM OF $ 1.50 FOR PHOTOCOPIES. RECEIPT # PAID .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2012
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2012
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 008 , HON. HERBERT DODELL, JUDGE PRO TEM PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING AC GREEN, JR. IN PRO PER . DEFENDANT APPEARING . THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. AT PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST. AS DISCLOSED IN 12Z01490 (CONNECTED UNLAWFUL DETAINER) COMMISSIONER CARNAHAN, WHO IN PART

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2012
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2012
  • DocketSUBPOENA DUCES TECUM AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED. SERVED AS NAMED AS TO RECONTRUST COMPANY .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (CWMBS, INC.) DEPOSITOR . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 12/03/12 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 008 . COSTS OF $ 50.00 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (CHL MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH TRUST 2006 TM1) ISSUER . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 12/03/12 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 008 . COSTS OF $ 50.00 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.) LOAN SERVICER . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 12/03/12 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 008 . COSTS OF $ 50.00 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (THE BANK OF NEW YORK) TRUSTEE . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 12/03/12 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 008 . COSTS OF $ 50.00 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (RECONTRUST COMPANY, N.A.) TRUSTEE MAILSTOP TX2-984-04-07 . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 12/03/12 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 008 . COSTS OF $ 0.00 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2012
  • DocketSUBPOENA DUCES TECUM ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2012
  • DocketSUBPOENA DUCES TECUM ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2012
  • DocketSUBPOENA DUCES TECUM ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2012
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # PAID . HEARING SET FOR 12/03/12 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CWMBS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where MERS MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CHL MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH TRUST 2007-HY7 is a litigant

Latest cases where RECONTRUST COMPANY N.A is a litigant