This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/20/2019 at 21:22:35 (UTC).

GREAT WESTERN CAPITAL, LLC., A CALIF. LIMITED CO. VS JAMES HERRERA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/10/2019 GREAT WESTERN CAPITAL, LLC , A CALIF LIMITED CO filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JAMES HERRERA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D. DODSON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1389

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM D. DODSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GREAT WESTERN CAPITAL LLC. A CALIF. LIMITED CO.

Defendants

CARLISLE JR. SAMUEL

HERRERA JAIME

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLOCK DENNIS P.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/10/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

5/10/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

5/10/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (JAMES HERRERA)

5/10/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (JAMES HERRERA)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (SAMUEL CARLISLE, JR.)

5/10/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (SAMUEL CARLISLE, JR.)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

5/10/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

5/10/2019: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/10/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale - Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale

6/4/2019: Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale - Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/4/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Affidavit (name extension) - Affidavit Pursuant to CCP 1169

6/4/2019: Affidavit (name extension) - Affidavit Pursuant to CCP 1169

Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

6/4/2019: Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

6/4/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/4/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/4/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Writ of (name extension) - Writ of Possession

6/5/2019: Writ of (name extension) - Writ of Possession

Writ - Return - Writ - Return

6/26/2019: Writ - Return - Writ - Return

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Wholly Satisfied); Clerk; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: Yes; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer: As To Unnamed Occupants: Yes; As To Parties changed from JAMES HERRERA (Defendant), SAMUEL CARLISLE, JR. (Defendant) to SAMUEL CARLISLE, JR. (Defendant), JAIME HERRERA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: As To Unnamed Occupants: Yes; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Possession: As To Unnamed Occupants: Yes; As To Parties changed from SAMUEL CARLISLE, JR. (Defendant), JAMES HERRERA (Defendant) to SAMUEL CARLISLE, JR. (Defendant), JAIME HERRERA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketWrit of Possession; Issued by: GREAT WESTERN CAPITAL, LLC., A CALIF. LIMITED CO. (Plaintiff); As to: JAMES HERRERA (Defendant); SAMUEL CARLISLE, JR. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- JAIME HERRERA (Defendant): First Name changed from JAMES to JAIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/19/2019 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: GREAT WESTERN CAPITAL, LLC., A CALIF. LIMITED CO. (Plaintiff); As to: JAMES HERRERA (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 05/15/2019; Service Cost: 77.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: GREAT WESTERN CAPITAL, LLC., A CALIF. LIMITED CO. (Plaintiff); Proof of Mailing Date: 05/15/2019; Service Cost: 77.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale; Filed by: GREAT WESTERN CAPITAL, LLC., A CALIF. LIMITED CO. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketPremise address is amended to 13041 FILMORE STREET, PACOIMA, CA 91331.; Default judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff GREAT WESTERN CAPITAL, LLC., A CALIF. LIMITED CO. against Defendant JAIME HERRERA and Defendant SAMUEL CARLISLE, JR. on the Complaint filed by GREAT WESTERN CAPITAL, LLC., A CALIF. LIMITED CO. on 05/10/2019 for a total of $0.00.; Judgment for possession is granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 13041 FILMORE STREET, PACOIMA, CA 91331 is granted for plaintiff(s);; The Rental Agreement under which the property is held is not cancelled.; Lease Agreement under which the property is held is not forfeited.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: GREAT WESTERN CAPITAL, LLC., A CALIF. LIMITED CO. (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; JAMES HERRERA (Defendant); SAMUEL CARLISLE, JR. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: GREAT WESTERN CAPITAL, LLC., A CALIF. LIMITED CO. (Plaintiff); As to: JAMES HERRERA (Defendant); SAMUEL CARLISLE, JR. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: GREAT WESTERN CAPITAL, LLC., A CALIF. LIMITED CO. (Plaintiff); As to: JAMES HERRERA (Defendant); SAMUEL CARLISLE, JR. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: GREAT WESTERN CAPITAL, LLC., A CALIF. LIMITED CO. (Plaintiff); As to: JAMES HERRERA (Defendant); SAMUEL CARLISLE, JR. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/19/2019 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 05/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William D. Dodson in Department R Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Great Western Capital, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLOCK DENNIS P.