Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/15/2017 at 10:53:59 (UTC).

GREAT HIRE, INC. , A CA CORPORATION VS DUSTIN TYLER

Case Summary

On 07/12/2017 GREAT HIRE, INC , A CA CORPORATION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DUSTIN TYLER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is FIRDAUS F. DORDI. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6420

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

FIRDAUS F. DORDI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GREAT HIRE INC. A CA CORPORATION

14241 Firestone Blvd Ste #400,

La Mirada, CA 90638

Defendant

TYLER DUSTIN AKA DOING BUSINESS AS HARMONY HEALTH PLUS

 

Court Documents

(Non-Jury Trial)

9/25/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Unknown

7/31/2017: Unknown

[Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]

8/1/2017: [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]

Unknown

8/1/2017: Unknown

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

7/12/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

7/12/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

7/12/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • Pursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/22/2017 at 08:30 AM in at Department P Not Held - Rescheduled by Party to 09/25/2017 08:30 AM at 09/25/2017 8:30 AM Non-Jury Trial in Department P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Great Hire, Inc. , A CA Corporation (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: 1170719E2987 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170719E2987 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Firdaus F. Dordi at Van Nuys Courthouse East in Department P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/22/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Great Hire, Inc. , A CA Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Dustin Tyler (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Case reassigned to Van Nuys Courthouse East in Department P; Reason: Judicial Officer not available

    Read MoreRead Less