Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/16/2019 at 01:17:30 (UTC).

GRANT KELLER VS UNDERRATED PRESENTS, INC

Case Summary

On 03/29/2019 GRANT KELLER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against UNDERRATED PRESENTS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS J. GRIEGO. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3719

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS J. GRIEGO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KELLER GRANT

Defendant

UNDERRATED PRESENTS INC

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

6/17/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

6/17/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

4/9/2019: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/29/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Grant Keller against Defendant Underrated Presents, Inc on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Grant Keller on 03/29/2019 for the principal amount of $1,950.00 and costs of $50.00 for a total of $2,000.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/17/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A updated: Result Date to 06/17/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Grant Keller (Plaintiff); As to: Underrated Presents, Inc (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 04/04/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): As To Parties changed from Underrated Presents, Inc (Defendant) to Underrated Presents, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Grant Keller (Plaintiff); As to: Underrated Presents, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas J. Griego in Department 1A Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/17/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNDERRATED PRESENTS INC. is a litigant