This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/17/2016 at 00:19:57 (UTC).

GRAHAM, CLARETHA VS PORTER, GORDON

Case Summary

On 12/16/2015 GRAHAM, CLARETHA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against PORTER, GORDON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5464

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRAHAM CLARETHA

Defendants

BISHOP MARI DONCETTA

PORTER GORDON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRAHAM, CLARETHA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2016
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED-RETURNED BY MAIL/VKB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • HEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • MEMO TO SET REJECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED-15 MIN(S) * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • COMPLAINT FILED - U.D. RESIDENTIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • OSC SET 06/13/16, 08:30 AM, DEPT. CLK PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less