This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/03/2018 at 08:09:40 (UTC).

GRAHAM BURFORD VS JONATHAN ESTOCK

Case Summary

On 07/17/2017 GRAHAM BURFORD filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JONATHAN ESTOCK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7010

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downey Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BURFORD GRAHAM

Long Beach, CA 90808

Defendant

ESTOCK JONATHAN

Gardena, CA 90248

 

Court Documents

Statement of Decision

12/29/2017: Statement of Decision

Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 12/29/2017

12/29/2017: Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 12/29/2017

(Ruling on Submitted Matter)

12/29/2017: (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

(Non-Jury Trial)

12/28/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Unknown

12/6/2017: Unknown

(Non-Jury Trial)

10/2/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Unknown

9/28/2017: Unknown

[Notice of Rejection]

9/27/2017: [Notice of Rejection]

Unknown

9/27/2017: Unknown

Unknown

9/26/2017: Unknown

Unknown

8/10/2017: Unknown

Unknown

8/15/2017: Unknown

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

7/17/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

7/17/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

7/17/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2017
  • Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 12/29/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • Other - Statement of Decision; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/28/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 12/28/2017; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Updated -- Notice of Rejection (VIA FAX): Name Extension: (VIA FAX)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • Notice of Rejection; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Graham Burford (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • On the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/02/2017 at 01:30 PM in at Department SE2 Held - Continued to 12/28/2017 08:30 AM at 12/28/2017 8:30 AM Non-Jury Trial in Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2017
  • Notice of Postponement; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • Pursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/26/2017 at 01:30 PM in at Department SE2 Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion to 10/02/2017 01:30 PM at 10/02/2017 1:30 PM Non-Jury Trial in Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Graham Burford (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: 1170718E8866 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170718E8866 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce at Downey Courthouse in Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/26/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Graham Burford (Plaintiff); As to: Jonathan Estock (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less