This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/01/2021 at 00:02:05 (UTC).

GOOD LOANS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS MAD MEN BURGER & GRILL, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/01/2020 GOOD LOANS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MAD MEN BURGER GRILL, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2928

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOOD LOANS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

MAD MEN BURGER & GRILL A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

GONZALEZ FLORENCIO CRUZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEDIONI DANIEL M

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/16/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order to Dismiss Case With the Court Retaining Jurisdiction Pursuant to CCP Section 664.6; Order Thereon

11/13/2020: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order to Dismiss Case With the Court Retaining Jurisdiction Pursuant to CCP Section 664.6; Order Thereon

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order Stipulation to Dismiss Case With the Court Retaining Jurisdiction Pursuant to CCP Section 664.6; Order Thereon

11/17/2020: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order Stipulation to Dismiss Case With the Court Retaining Jurisdiction Pursuant to CCP Section 664.6; Order Thereon

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/1/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

4/1/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/1/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

4/1/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/1/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order Stipulation to Dismiss Case With the Court Retaining Jurisdiction Pursuant to CCP Section 664.6; Order Thereon: Filed By: Good Loans, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 11/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Good Loans, LLC, a California limited liability company on 04/01/2020, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order Stipulation to Dismiss Case With the Court Retaining Jurisdiction Pursuant to CCP Section 664.6; Order Thereon; Signed and Filed by: Good Loans, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Mad Men Burger & Grill, a California corporation (Defendant); Florencio Cruz Gonzalez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order to Dismiss Case With the Court Retaining Jurisdiction Pursuant to CCP Section 664.6; Order Thereon; Filed by: Good Loans, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order to Dismiss Case With the Court Retaining Jurisdiction Pursuant to CCP Section 664.6; Order Thereon: Filed By: Good Loans, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); Result: Denied; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Good Loans, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Mad Men Burger & Grill, a California corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/13/2020; Service Cost: 80.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Good Loans, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Mad Men Burger & Grill, a California corporation (Defendant); Florencio Cruz Gonzalez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Good Loans, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Mad Men Burger & Grill, a California corporation (Defendant); Florencio Cruz Gonzalez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Good Loans, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Mad Men Burger & Grill, a California corporation (Defendant); Florencio Cruz Gonzalez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GOOD LOANS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEDIONI DANIEL M