This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/06/2021 at 06:11:24 (UTC).

GOOD LOANS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS JOSEPH URBAN AMBROSE, JR., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/22/2020 GOOD LOANS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JOSEPH URBAN AMBROSE, JR . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0594

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOOD LOANS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

AMBROSE RHONDA

AMBROSE JOSEPH URBAN JR. DBA AMBROSE CATTLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEDIONI DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/5/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

1/15/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

1/15/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/22/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

12/22/2020: Complaint - Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

12/22/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/22/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/22/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2023
  • Hearing12/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • Hearing06/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Good Loans, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Joseph Urban Ambrose, Jr. (Defendant); Rhonda Ambrose (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to Joseph Urban Ambrose, Jr. Rhonda Ambrose; On the Complaint filed by Good Loans, LLC, a California limited liability company on 12/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Good Loans, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Rhonda Ambrose (Defendant); Service Date: 01/07/2021; Service Cost: 310.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Good Loans, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Joseph Urban Ambrose, Jr. (Defendant); Service Date: 01/07/2021; Service Cost: 95.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Good Loans, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Joseph Urban Ambrose, Jr. (Defendant); Rhonda Ambrose (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Good Loans, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Joseph Urban Ambrose, Jr. (Defendant); Rhonda Ambrose (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Good Loans, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Joseph Urban Ambrose, Jr. (Defendant); Rhonda Ambrose (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEDIONI DANIEL M