This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/03/2019 at 02:51:36 (UTC).

GONZALO PATRICIO JURADO VS JMS AIR CONDITIONING AND APPLIANCE SERVICE INC.

Case Summary

On 08/10/2018 GONZALO PATRICIO JURADO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JMS AIR CONDITIONING AND APPLIANCE SERVICE INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MATTHEW ST. GEORGE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2531

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MATTHEW ST. GEORGE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JURADO GONZALO PATRICIO

Venice, CA 90291

Defendant

JMS AIR CONDITIONING AND APPLIANCE SERVICE INC.

7640 Burne Avenue

Van Nuys, CA 91405

 

Court Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Nachiely Bravo/ JMS A/C & Appliance employee

10/1/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Nachiely Bravo/ JMS A/C & Appliance employee

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Yosef Musica/ President

10/23/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Yosef Musica/ President

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

9/21/2018: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

10/23/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/23/2018

10/23/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/23/2018

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

8/28/2018: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

10/1/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/01/2018

10/1/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/01/2018

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

8/10/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2018
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Gonzalo Patricio Jurado on 08/10/2018, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Yosef Musica/ President; Filed by: JMS Air Conditioning and Appliance Service Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/23/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/23/2018 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department E updated: Result Date to 10/23/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • Updated -- Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims): Result: Granted; Result Date: 10/23/2018; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/01/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Nachiely Bravo/ JMS A/C & Appliance employee; Filed by: JMS Air Conditioning and Appliance Service Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/23/2018 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: JMS Air Conditioning and Appliance Service Inc. (Defendant); Has the Claim Been Served?: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by: Gonzalo Patricio Jurado (Plaintiff); As to: JMS Air Conditioning and Appliance Service Inc. (Defendant); Mailing Date: 08/23/2018; Service Cost: 40.00; Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Gonzalo Patricio Jurado (Plaintiff); As to: JMS Air Conditioning and Appliance Service Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • Pursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/01/2018 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department E Held - Continued was rescheduled to 10/23/2018 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Matthew St. George in Department E Santa Monica Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/01/2018 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department E

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JMS AIR CONDITIONING & APPLIANCE SERVICE is a litigant