This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 01:14:37 (UTC).

GONZALEZ, MARIA VS PADILLA, FERNANDO

Case Summary

On 09/18/2015 GONZALEZ, MARIA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PADILLA, FERNANDO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are AMY YERKEY and MICHAEL PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8022

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

AMY YERKEY

Judge

MICHAEL PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GONZALEZ MARIA PASSENGER BY AND THROUGH GUARDIAN AD LITEM

GONZALEZ MARIA

Defendants

PADILLA FERNANDO DRIVER

BENNETT ENTERPRISES DBA BENNETT LANDSCAPE OWNER

PADILLA FERNANDO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2015
  • DocketAFTER SUBMISSION, COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • DocketJUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 12/21/15 . THE COURT ORDERS THAT THE DEFENDANT(S) DOES NOT OWE PLAINTIFF(S) ANY MONEY ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. SE2 , HON. AMY YERKEY PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . DEFENDANT APPEARING .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • DocketCOURT TAKES MATTER UNDER SUBMISSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • DocketAUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (BENNETT ENTERPRISES) DBA (BENNETT LANDSCAPE) OWNER .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • DocketCOURT TIME CHANGE DUE TO PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE NOTICE OF COURT TRIAL FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 12/18/15 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. SE2 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • DocketPEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO CCP 170.6 FILED BY (GONZALEZ, MARIA) PASSENGER BY AND THROUGH GUARDIAN AD LITEM AS TO HONORABLE MICHAEL PEARCE . MATTER TRANSFERRED TO DEPARTMENT SE2 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (PADILLA, FERNANDO) DRIVER . COSTS OF $ 50.00 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (BENNETT ENTERPRISES) DBA (BENNETT LANDSCAPE) OWNER . COSTS OF $ 50.00 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPT SE2 RE: SMALL CLAIMS FUTURE DATE .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING GLORIA ALVARADO AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MARIA GONZALEZ , A MINOR, SIGNED AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN DOW. HEARING SET FOR 12/18/15 AT 08:30 AM IN DPT. SE2.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • DocketPETITION AND APPOINTMENT OF MARIA GONZALEZ FOR (GLORIA ALVARADO) A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM MARIA GONZALEZ , RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO DEPT. 002 FOR CONSIDERATION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bennett Enterprises, Inc. is a litigant