This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/16/2019 at 17:47:09 (UTC).

GONZALES, ARTHUR VS. ALAMO, JENNY

Case Summary

On 01/06/2012 GONZALES, ARTHUR filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ALAMO, JENNY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Huntington Park Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0017

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Huntington Park Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GONZALES ARTHUR

Defendants

ALAMO JENNY

ORTEGA ALEX

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2013
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2013
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 02/05/13 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2012
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2012
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 01/30/12 , FOR (GONZALES, ARTHUR) , AGAINST (ALAMO, JENNY) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 7102 RITA AVE. APT. 4, HUNTINGTON PK, CA 90255 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2012
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2012
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP; DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2012
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO (ALAMO, JENNY) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (ALAMO, JENNY) , (ORTEGA, ALEX) . COSTS OF $ 70.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2012
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (ALAMO, JENNY) , (ORTEGA, ALEX) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2012
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN HPK478659011.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2012
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2012
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2012
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2012
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 02/21/12 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 002 .

    Read MoreRead Less