This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/18/2019 at 00:58:11 (UTC).

GOLDMAN, MIKHAIL VS HAKKASAN USA, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/08/2015 GOLDMAN, MIKHAIL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HAKKASAN USA, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD F. WALMARK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0859

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARD F. WALMARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOLDMAN MIKHAIL

Defendants

HAKKASAN USA INC.

HAKKASAN LLC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2016
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM NWP .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (HAKKASAN USA, INC.) . KEVIN KLEIN, MANAGER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NWP , HON. RICHARD F. WALMARK PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . DEFENDANT APPEARING BY KEVIN KLEIN .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • COURT TAKES MATTER UNDER SUBMISSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • AFTER SUBMISSION, COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, COURT DOES NOT HAVE JURISDICTION AND PLAINTIFF SUED THE WRONG . PARTY. COURT ORDERS SUBBOENA ISSUED QUASHED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • CORRESSPONDANCE RECEIVED RECEIVED AS TO LAURETTA L KEHOE .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • ANSWER ON REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER AND ANSWER FILED BY (GOLDMAN, MIKHAIL) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2015
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPT. NWP FOR CONSIDERATION SC-105 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2015
  • REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER AND ANSWER RE: DISMISS THE LAWSUIT WITH PREJUDICE AND QUASH THE SUBPOEANA FOR THE REASONS SET FORTH IN FORM MC-031 ATTACHED FILED BY (HAKKASAN USA, INC.) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT FILED. SERVED AS TO (HAKKASAN USA, INC.) . SIGNED BY AMY MCLAREN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT FILED. SERVED AS TO (HAKKASAN, LLC) . SIGNED BY AMY MCLAREN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE RE: PROCESS ON CASE RECEIVED FROM CT AND PLACED INTO CASE FILE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN FEE WAIVER. HEARING SET FOR 02/01/16 AT 08:30 AM IN DPT. NWP.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY (GOLDMAN, MIKHAIL) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES SIGNED AND FILED AS TO (GOLDMAN, MIKHAIL) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT MAILED BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO DEFENDANT(S) (HAKKASAN, LLC) . RECEIPT # LAV . 70151730000039552916

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT MAILED BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO DEFENDANT(S) (HAKKASAN, LLC) . RECEIPT # LAV . 70151730000039552923

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hakkasan Limited is a litigant