This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/25/2016 at 18:56:23 (UTC).

GOLDERG, BARRY P VS GRAB, KERSTIN

Case Summary

On 06/13/2014 GOLDERG, BARRY P filed an Other lawsuit against GRAB, KERSTIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7923

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOLDERG BARRY P

Defendants

GRAB KERSTIN

VALLEY ORTHOPEDIC AND SPINE CENTER

MIRACLE MILE MEDICAL CENTER

SOCRATES INC

THE SPINE INSTITUTE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF MATTHEW S ERICKSON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2016
  • PRE-TRIAL MINUTES-CONTD TO 07/18/17 AT 08:30 A M IN DEPT. 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • NOTICE OF RULING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • NOTICE OF RULING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • MOTION FILED: EX PARTE MOTION HEARING SET FOR 11/02/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • MOTION RULING ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • A/C CALENDAR-HEARING DATE DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • NON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 02/23/16, 08:30 AM, DEPT 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • MOTION FILED: MOT FOR DISCHARGE & FEES HEARING SET FOR 12/08/15

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 10/10/2014
  • RECEIVED AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • RECEIVED APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - FILED & ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • NON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 12/14/15, 08:30 AM, DEPT 77 * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • OSC SET 06/13/17, 08:30 AM, DEPT. 77 PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2014
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2014
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2014
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT #CCH420411052 $4000.00 BY BARRY P. GOLDBERG APLC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE SPINE INSTITUTE INC is a litigant

Latest cases where MIRACLE MILE MEDICAL CENTER LLC is a litigant