Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/17/2020 at 22:28:12 (UTC).

GOLDEN STATE MOBILE LODGE, L.P. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP VS ARTHURIE E. BURAIMOH

Case Summary

On 11/20/2019 GOLDEN STATE MOBILE LODGE, L P A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ARTHURIE E BURAIMOH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DOUGLAS W. STERN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2770

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

DOUGLAS W. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOLDEN STATE MOBILE LODGE L.P. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP DBA GOLDEN STATE MOBILE LODGE

Defendant

BURAIMOH ARTHURIE E.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WEAVER LARRY WAYNE

 

Court Documents

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/20/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/20/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

11/20/2019: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Complaint - Complaint

11/20/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/20/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Arthurie E. Buraimoh)

11/22/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Arthurie E. Buraimoh)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

11/22/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Application And Order To Serve Summons By Posting For Unlawful Detainer]

12/4/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Application And Order To Serve Summons By Posting For Unlawful Detainer]

Application (name extension) - Application And Order To Serve Summons By Posting For Unlawful Detainer

12/4/2019: Application (name extension) - Application And Order To Serve Summons By Posting For Unlawful Detainer

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

12/16/2019: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Service by Posting - Proof of Service by Posting

12/16/2019: Proof of Service by Posting - Proof of Service by Posting

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/30/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/31/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Posting - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

12/31/2019: Proof of Service by Posting - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/3/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

1/3/2020: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale - Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale

1/3/2020: Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale - Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles )

1/7/2020: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles )

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (Los Angeles ): Filed By: Golden State Mobile Lodge, L.P. a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff); Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 02/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Wholly Satisfied);; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: Yes; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketWrit of Execution (Los Angeles ); Issued by: Golden State Mobile Lodge, L.P. a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff); As to: Arthurie E. Buraimoh (Defendant); County: Los Angeles; Principal: 0.00; Interest: 0.00; Costs: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Entry of Default / Judgment: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Entry of Default / Judgment: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Golden State Mobile Lodge, L.P. a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff); As to: Arthurie E. Buraimoh (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketJudgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Golden State Mobile Lodge, L.P. a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to Arthurie E. Buraimoh; On the Complaint filed by Golden State Mobile Lodge, L.P. a California Limited Partnership on 11/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff Golden State Mobile Lodge, L.P. a California Limited Partnership DBA Golden State Mobile Lodge against Defendant Arthurie E. Buraimoh on the Complaint filed by Golden State Mobile Lodge, L.P. a California Limited Partnership on 11/20/2019 for a total of $0.00.; Judgment for possession is not granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 22600 S. Normandie Avenue Space No. 12, Torrance, CA 90502 is granted for plaintiff(s);; The Rental Agreement under which the property is held is hereby cancelled.; Lease Agreement under which the property is held is hereby forfeited.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale; Filed by: Golden State Mobile Lodge, L.P. a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Application And Order To Serve Summons By Posting For Unlawful Detainer]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 11/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Golden State Mobile Lodge, L.P. a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff); As to: Arthurie E. Buraimoh (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/29/2020 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Douglas W. Stern in Department S13 Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Golden State Mobile Lodge, L.P. a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff); As to: Arthurie E. Buraimoh (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Golden State Mobile Lodge, L.P. a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff); As to: Arthurie E. Buraimoh (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: Status Date changed from 11/21/2019 to 11/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEAVER LARRY WAYNE