Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2019 at 12:52:40 (UTC).

GLORIA ESCOBEDO VS DEANA PEREZ

Case Summary

On 10/18/2017 GLORIA ESCOBEDO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DEANA PEREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE LU. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3121

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RODRIGUEZ MARIBEL

RODRIGUEZ LISET

ESCOBEDO GLORIA

Defendant

PEREZ DEANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEZA JORGE ALBERTO

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

4/17/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

4/17/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof...)

5/23/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof...)

Summons - on Complaint

10/18/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/18/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

10/18/2017: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/18/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2020
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: (name extension)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment/Dismissal scheduled for 11/19/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/23/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 05/23/2019; Result Type to Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/23/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 05/23/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/23/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/23/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Gloria Escobedo (Plaintiff); Maribel Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Liset Rodriguez (Plaintiff); As to: Deana Perez (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/17/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 05/23/2019 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: Name Extension changed from on Complaint to on Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Gloria Escobedo (Plaintiff); As to: Deana Perez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Gloria Escobedo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine Lu in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/17/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEZA JORGE A.