This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/07/2019 at 14:01:36 (UTC).

GLOBE CON FREIGHT SYSTEMS VS UNION BANK, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/14/2016 GLOBE CON FREIGHT SYSTEMS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against UNION BANK, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0439

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GLOBE CON FREIGHT SYSTEMS

18420 Broadwick St.

Compton, CA 90220

Defendant

UNION BANK LLC

15800 S. Western Ave.

Gardena, CA 90247

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Settlement Agreement

10/5/2016: Small Claims Settlement Agreement

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 10/05/2016

10/5/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 10/05/2016

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

10/5/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

6/14/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

8/8/2016: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 08/08/2016

8/8/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 08/08/2016

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

8/8/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/5/2016: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

10/5/2016: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

10/5/2016: Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2016
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • Updated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: Result Date changed from 08/08/2016 to 10/05/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 10/05/2016; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/05/2016 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Taken off Calendar by Party on 10/05/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Globe Con Freight Systems (Plaintiff); Union Bank, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • Small Claims Settlement Agreement; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • Updated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: Result: Result Date: 08/08/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/05/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/05/2016 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Globe Con Freight Systems (Plaintiff); As to: Union Bank, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: IW-2016-0000714 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • Invoice: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Fee: $4.50; Payment: 4.50 Receipt: IW-2016-0000714 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/08/2016 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • Payment: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Amount: $4.50 Receipt: IW-2016-0000714

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • Payment: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Amount: $50.00 Receipt: IW-2016-0000714

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • Payment: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Amount: $50.00 Receipt: IW-2016-0000717 (Cash)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • Payment: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Amount: $4.50 Receipt: IW-2016-0000717 (Cash)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.