This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2021 at 15:39:48 (UTC).

GLOBAL INNOVATION DEVELOPMENT, INC. VS WICR WATERPROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION, INC.

Case Summary

On 09/17/2020 GLOBAL INNOVATION DEVELOPMENT, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WICR WATERPROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1572

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GLOBAL INNOVATION DEVELOPMENT INC.

Defendant

WICR WATERPROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION INC.

 

Court Documents

Attachment - Attachment

9/17/2020: Attachment - Attachment

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Attachment, Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]

9/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Attachment, Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

9/17/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Attachment, Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]

11/10/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Attachment, Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

11/10/2020: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Attachment - Attachment

11/10/2020: Attachment - Attachment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/9/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

1/8/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice of Postponement - Notice of Postponement

12/18/2020: Notice of Postponement - Notice of Postponement

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

12/18/2020: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

3/15/2021: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice Of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer]

2/26/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice Of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer]

Notice of Postponement - Notice of Postponement

3/18/2021: Notice of Postponement - Notice of Postponement

Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

3/18/2021: Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

6/7/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Global Innovation Development, Inc. on 09/17/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Global Innovation Development, Inc. as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Global Innovation Development, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/06/2021 at 10:00 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims): As To Parties changed from WICR Waterproofing and Construction, Inc. (Defendant) to WICR Waterproofing and Construction, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketPursuant to the request of defendant, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/09/2021 at 10:00 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 07/06/2021 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketOrder on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk; As to: WICR Waterproofing and Construction, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Postponement; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketRequest to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: WICR Waterproofing and Construction, Inc. (Defendant); Has the Claim Been Served?: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice Of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketNotice Of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Global Innovation Development, Inc. (Plaintiff); WICR Waterproofing and Construction, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 01/19/2021 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketAttachment; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Attachment, Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Global Innovation Development, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: WICR Waterproofing and Construction, Inc. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/02/2020; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Attachment, Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketAttachment; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld in Department S Santa Monica Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Global Innovation Development, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: WICR Waterproofing and Construction, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GLOBAL INNOVATION DEVELOPMENT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where WICR WATERPROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION INC. is a litigant