This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 21:36:44 (UTC).

GLENDALE ACCEPTANCE LLC VS FAIRVIEW EAST LLC

Case Summary

On 08/25/2016 GLENDALE ACCEPTANCE LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FAIRVIEW EAST LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT J. SCHUIT. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3592

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT J. SCHUIT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GLENDALE ACCEPTANCE LLC

Defendant

FAIRVIEW EAST LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BEVERLY HILLS LAW CORP, PC - SAGAR P PARIKH

Attorney at BEVERLY HILLS LAW CORP, PC

PARIKH SAGAR P

 

Court Documents

Summons - Summons

8/25/2016: Summons - Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/25/2016: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

8/25/2016: Complaint - Complaint

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

8/30/2016: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint - Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

9/6/2016: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint - Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause - Hearing Other)

8/12/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause - Hearing Other)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause - Hearing Other) of 08/12/2019

8/12/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause - Hearing Other) of 08/12/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause - Hearing Other)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause - Hearing Other) of 08/12/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by GLENDALE ACCEPTANCE LLC on 08/25/2016, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action, pursuant to the Court's own motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Hearing Other scheduled for 08/12/2019 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 updated: Result Date to 08/12/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO SHELF 1 RE: FILE REVIEWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (FAIRVIEW EAST LLC) . SUB SERVED ON 08/29/16, MAILED ON 08/29/16 DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE ATTACHED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • DocketOSC HEARING IS SET FOR 08/12/19 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT F43 . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY ROBERT J. SCHUIT, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO RECORDS RE: FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED. RN CHA511599008. Filing Fee: 370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: (GLENDALE ACCEPTANCE LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GLENDALE ACCEPTANCE LLC A CALIFORNIA... is a litigant

Latest cases where FAIRVIEW EAST LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARIKH SAGAR P.