This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 07:06:57 (UTC).

GLENDALE ACCEPTANCE LLC VS ALPHA CONSTRUCTION SERVICES IN

Case Summary

On 12/05/2016 GLENDALE ACCEPTANCE LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ALPHA CONSTRUCTION SERVICES IN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT J. SCHUIT. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0902

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT J. SCHUIT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GLENDALE ACCEPTANCE LLC

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

FAIRVIEW EAST LLC

GAO LUCY XIANGXIN

LIU CIEN-KUO

ALPHA CONSTRUCTION SERVICES INC

UNI-GLORY DEVELOPMENT INC

ZHANG GEORGE YUGUANG

Cross Defendant

PT CONSTRUCTION & INVESTMENT INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BEVERLY HILLS LAW CORP, PC - SAGAR P PARIKH

Attorney at BEVERLY HILLS LAW CORP, PC

PARIKH SAGAR P

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

HO ROLAND Y.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2017
  • DocketRECEIPT FOR RECORD ON RECLASSIFIED CASE FILED. NEW CASE NUMBER EC066154 . PRIOR CASE#:16A20902 DEEMED RECLASSIFIED PER CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON 12/28/16 TO UNLIMITED CIVIL - GLENDALE COURTHOUSE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • DocketANSWER OF DEFENDANTS ALPHA CONSTRUCTION INC. AND CHIEN KUO LIU RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO GLENDALE COURT ON 01/11/17 FOR PROCESSING. BALANCE OF FIRST PAPER FEES PAID.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • DocketCROSS-COMPLAINT OF 12/28/16 HAVING BEEN FILED PURSUANT TO SECTIONS CCP 403.010 THROUGH 403.090, AND FEES HAVING BEEN PAID, THIS CASE IS DEEMED RECLASSIFIED TO A GENERAL (UNLIMITED) JURISDICTION. RECEIPT # PAID PRIOR . RECLASSIFICATION FEES PAID ON 12/28/16 ON RECEIPT #: CHA511599022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • DocketTHIS CASE HAVING BEEN RECLASSIFIED & FEES HAVING BEEN PAID, ENTIRE FILE FORWARDED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT GLENDALE COURTHOUSE VIA COURT MAIL TRACKING SYSTEM-TRACKING ID NUMBER:Z900000020972. RECLASSIFIED TO UNLIMITED CIVIL. PRIOR CASE#:16A20902 . RECEIPT # PAID PRIOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF RECLASSIFICATION TO A GENERAL (UNLIMITED) JURISDICTION FILED & MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO GLENDALE COURTHOUSE - UNLIMITED CIVIL DEPARTMENT RE: RECLASSIFICATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • DocketANSWER FILED OF (FAIRVIEW EAST LLC) . RECEIPT # CHA511599022 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • DocketCROSS-COMPLAINT FILED. CROSS-COMPLAINANT(S): (FAIRVIEW EAST LLC) A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY . CROSS-DEFENDANT(S): (PT CONSTRUCTION & INVESTMENT INC) A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION . RECEIPT # CHA511599022 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • DocketOSC HEARING IS SET FOR 11/20/19 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT F43 . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY ROBERT J. SCHUIT, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO RECORDS RE: FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED. RN CHA511599018. Filing Fee: 370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GLENDALE ACCEPTANCE LLC A CALIFORNIA... is a litigant

Latest cases where FAIRVIEW EAST LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARIKH SAGAR P.