This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/07/2016 at 17:38:39 (UTC).

GLASSICAL CREATIONS INC. VS. WARD, NORMA E.

Case Summary

On 12/05/2014 GLASSICAL CREATIONS INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against WARD, NORMA E. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1395

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GLASSICAL CREATIONS INC.

Defendants

WARD NORMA E. DBA LITTLE OLD MEXICAN BAKERY

ACEVEDO ISABEL DBA LITTLE OLD MEXICAN BAKERY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MANDELBAUM & ROBISON - WILLIAM C. ROBISON

Attorney at MANDELBAUM & ROBISON

MANDELBAUM & ROBISON, LLP - WILLIAM C. ROBISON

Attorney at MANDELBAUM & ROBISON, LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2015
  • SUPPLEMENTAL - WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED AND FILED WHOLLY SATISFIED FROM THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES . WITH ADDED COSTS OF $145.00 POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 270.00 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # PRD . PICKUP BOX UNDER 'DDS'

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 78.73 PER DAY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # PRD . COUNTRYWIDE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 78.73 PER DAY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2015
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 01/06/15 , FOR (GLASSICAL CREATIONS INC.) , AGAINST (WARD, NORMA E. ) DBA (LITTLE OLD MEXICAN BAKERY) , (ACEVEDO, ISABEL) DBA (LITTLE OLD MEXICAN BAKERY) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 223 W. ANAHEIM ST. WILMINGTON, CA 90744 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2015
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO JOSEPH L. CRUZ DDS FOR REJECTION OF MEMORANDUM TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-NO ANSWER FILED SUBMITTED ON 12/30/14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2014
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO (WARD, NORMA E. ) DBA (LITTLE OLD MEXICAN BAKERY) , (ACEVEDO, ISABEL) DBA (LITTLE OLD MEXICAN BAKERY) , ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2014
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED AS TO (WARD, NORMA E. ) DBA (LITTLE OLD MEXICAN BAKERY) , (ACEVEDO, ISABEL) DBA (LITTLE OLD MEXICAN BAKERY) ,UNNAMED OCCUPANTS ON 12/30/14 . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED. PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2014
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2014
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN PRD.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2014
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2014
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2014
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 06/03/15 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. S12 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GLASSICAL CREATIONS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBISON WILLIAM CHARLES