Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2021 at 11:48:45 (UTC).

GISSELLE REGALADO VS ADRIAN RAMIREZ JR, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/29/2020 GISSELLE REGALADO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ADRIAN RAMIREZ JR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Covina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DONNA HOLLINGSWORTH. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1271

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Covina Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

DONNA HOLLINGSWORTH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REGALADO GISSELLE

Defendants

RAMIREZ SR ADRIAN

RAMIREZ JR ADRIAN

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/2/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/2/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial (CONT: COVID-19))

12/22/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial (CONT: COVID-19))

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial (CONT: COVID-19)) of 12/22/2020

12/22/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial (CONT: COVID-19)) of 12/22/2020

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

12/22/2020: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

6/30/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 06/30/2020

6/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 06/30/2020

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Remote Appearances Information Packet

7/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Remote Appearances Information Packet

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

5/12/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 05/12/2020

5/12/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 05/12/2020

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

4/29/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

4/30/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Gisselle Regalado on 04/29/2020 as follows: Defendants Adrian Ramirez Jr; Adrian Ramirez Sr do not owe the plaintiff Gisselle Regalado any money on plaintiff's claim.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial (CONT: COVID-19))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial (CONT: COVID-19)) of 12/22/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial (CONT: COVID-19) scheduled for 12/22/2020 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 3 updated: Result Date to 12/22/2020; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Gisselle Regalado (Plaintiff); As to: Adrian Ramirez Jr (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/23/20; Service Cost: 80.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Gisselle Regalado (Plaintiff); As to: Adrian Ramirez Sr (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/23/20; Service Cost: 80.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Remote Appearances Information Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial (CONT: COVID-19) scheduled for 12/22/2020 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/03/2020 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 3 Not Held - Trailed was rescheduled to 09/03/2020 02:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/03/2020 at 02:00 PM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 05/12/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Adrian Ramirez Jr (Defendant), Adrian Ramirez Sr (Defendant) to Adrian Ramirez Sr (Defendant), Adrian Ramirez Jr (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Request to Waive Court Fees: Result Date changed from 04/30/2020 to 04/30/2020; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/03/2020 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Gisselle Regalado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Gisselle Regalado (Plaintiff); As to: Adrian Ramirez Jr (Defendant); Adrian Ramirez Sr (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Gisselle Regalado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Donna Hollingsworth in Department 3 West Covina Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less