This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/21/2019 at 04:02:14 (UTC).

GHASSAN S BISHARAT VS ISIS T CORTES

Case Summary

On 12/03/2018 GHASSAN S BISHARAT filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ISIS T CORTES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D. DODSON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4983

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM D. DODSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BISHARAT GHASSAN S

Defendant

CORTES ISIS T

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BISHARAT NABIL ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

Writ - Return - Writ - Return (Wholly Satisfied - Los Angeles County)

8/16/2019: Writ - Return - Writ - Return (Wholly Satisfied - Los Angeles County)

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

5/16/2019: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)

5/17/2019: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)

Request for Court Order and Answer - Request for Court Order and Answer

4/3/2019: Request for Court Order and Answer - Request for Court Order and Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]

4/4/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]

Answer on Request for Court Order and Answer - Answer on Request for Court Order and Answer

4/8/2019: Answer on Request for Court Order and Answer - Answer on Request for Court Order and Answer

Order on Request for Court Order - Order on Request for Court Order

4/9/2019: Order on Request for Court Order - Order on Request for Court Order

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order]

4/9/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order]

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Small Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo) of 03/11/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

3/11/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Small Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo) of 03/11/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - Minute Order (Small Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo)

3/11/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Small Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

3/11/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment - Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment

2/11/2019: Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment - Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 02/05/2019

2/5/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 02/05/2019

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

2/5/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

2/5/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial), Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter), Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)]

2/6/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial), Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter), Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)]

Notice of Hearing on Small Claims Appeal - Notice of Hearing on Small Claims Appeal

2/11/2019: Notice of Hearing on Small Claims Appeal - Notice of Hearing on Small Claims Appeal

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

1/17/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 08/19/2019 ; Status Date changed from 03/11/2019 to 08/19/2019 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (Los Angeles): Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 08/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment (See Writ Return 8//16/2019); Filed by: Clerk; As to: Isis T Cortes (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketWrit - Return (Wholly Satisfied - Los Angeles County) ( Wholly Satisfied); Clerk; Costs Credits: 188.84; Interest Credits: 86.00; Principal Credits: 6,280.00; Possession: Yes; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: Ghassan S Bisharat (Plaintiff); As to: Isis T Cortes (Defendant); Interest: 111.84

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Court Order and Answer: Filed By: Isis T Cortes (Defendant on defendant's claim); Result: Denied; Result Date: 04/09/2019; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketOrder on Request for Court Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Isis T Cortes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Order on Request for Court Order: As To Parties changed from Isis T Cortes (Defendant) to Isis T Cortes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/17/2019 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A updated: Result Date to 01/17/2019; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • DocketCase reassigned to Pasadena Courthouse in Department A - Hon. Annabelle G. Cortezeffective 12/24/2018; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Isis T Cortes (Defendant); As to: Ghassan S Bisharat (Plaintiff); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 12/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- 01/17/2019 Non-Jury Trial: Location changed from Department R to Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Ghassan S Bisharat (Plaintiff); Isis T Cortes (Defendant); As to: Isis T Cortes (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 12/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketDefendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims); Filed by: Isis T Cortes (Defendant); As to: Ghassan S Bisharat (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Ghassan S Bisharat (Plaintiff); As to: Isis T Cortes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William D. Dodson in Department R Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/17/2019 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department R

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NABIL A. BISHARAT