This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/24/2016 at 21:04:22 (UTC).

G&G HEALTHCARE INC VS AMEY ENTERPRISES INC

Case Summary

On 08/15/2013 G G HEALTHCARE INC filed an Other lawsuit against AMEY ENTERPRISES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1419

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

G&G HEALTHCARE INC

Defendants

AMEY ENTERPRISES INC

ZAD SINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TIMOTHY R BICE ESQ

Defendant Attorney

DRUCKER, MICHAEL S

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2015
  • DocketCASE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GC 68152 D(1)/GC 68152 D(2)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2014
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE-ENTIRE ACTION, FILED & ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2014
  • DocketHEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2013
  • DocketSUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT ONLY PENDING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2013
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2013
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND NOT ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2013
  • DocketRESPONSE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2013
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED FOR FICTITIOUS NAME

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2013
  • DocketNON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 02/17/15, 08:30 AM, DEPT 77 * * DELETED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2013
  • DocketOSC SET 08/15/16, 08:30 AM, DEPT. 77 PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER * * DELETED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2013
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMEY ENTERPRISE INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DRUCKER MICHAEL