This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/24/2021 at 06:50:15 (UTC).

GEVORG MARKOSYAN VS LOUIS VAZQUEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/17/2020 GEVORG MARKOSYAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LOUIS VAZQUEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BEVERLY BOURNE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0266

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

BEVERLY BOURNE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARKOSYAN GEVORG

Defendants

VAZQUEZ LOUIS

GLENAIR INC

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

2/27/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

2/7/2020: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

1/17/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

1/17/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1/17/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/02/2020 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Gevorg Markosyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Gevorg Markosyan on 01/17/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Gevorg Markosyan as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Gevorg Markosyan (Plaintiff); As to: Glenair, Inc (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/02/2020 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Beverly Bourne in Department A Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Gevorg Markosyan (Plaintiff); As to: Louis Vazquez (Defendant); Glenair, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Glenair, Inc. is a litigant