Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2018 at 10:35:59 (UTC).

GEULA YACOBY VS YUSSEF SAKHAI

Case Summary

On 07/19/2017 GEULA YACOBY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against YUSSEF SAKHAI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5303

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YACOBY GEULA

Los Angeles, CA 90035

Defendant

SAKHAI YUSSEF

Culver City, CA 90232

 

Court Documents

Unknown

2/15/2018: Unknown

Unknown

2/15/2018: Unknown

(Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)

2/2/2018: (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)

Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment) of 02/02/2018

2/2/2018: Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment) of 02/02/2018

Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal) of 04/06/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

4/6/2018: Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal) of 04/06/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

(Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

4/6/2018: (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

Unknown

10/11/2017: Unknown

[Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration]

10/11/2017: [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration]

Unknown

9/12/2017: Unknown

(Non-Jury Trial)

9/12/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Unknown

9/15/2017: Unknown

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/12/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

9/12/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/12/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Unknown

8/31/2017: Unknown

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

7/19/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2018
  • Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal) of 04/06/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal scheduled for 04/06/2018 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 04/06/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Notice of Appeal on Denial of Motion to Vacate; Filed by: Yussef Sakhai (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal scheduled for 04/06/2018 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Notice of Hearing on Small Claims Appeal; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment) of 02/02/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment scheduled for 02/02/2018 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 02/02/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration; Filed by: Yussef Sakhai (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/12/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/12/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/12/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 09/12/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Geula Yacoby against Defendant Yussef Sakhai on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Geula Yacoby on 07/19/2017 for the principal amount of $400.00 and costs of $75.00 for a total of $475.00, joint and several.; Other: Default judgment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Filed by: Geula Yacoby (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Geula Yacoby (Plaintiff); As to: Yussef Sakhai (Defendant); Service Cost: 45.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 07/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Geula Yacoby (Plaintiff); As to: Yussef Sakhai (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims <= $1,500: Filing for $1,500 or less- CCP 116.230(b)(1); Fee: $30.00; Payment: 30.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0015451 (Check); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/12/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less