This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/09/2019 at 01:29:17 (UTC).

GERIANNE GERALDETTE BROWN VS CARLOS FCO CANCHOLA RUIZ

Case Summary

On 03/27/2018 GERIANNE GERALDETTE BROWN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CARLOS FCO CANCHOLA RUIZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Covina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN J. TOWNSEND. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1221

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Covina Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SUSAN J. TOWNSEND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BROWN GERIANNE GERALDETTE

San Dimas, CA 91773

Defendant

RUIZ CARLOS FCO CANCHOLA AKA CARLOS CANCHOLOS APPLIANCES

Azusa, CA 91702

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment) of 08/23/2018

8/23/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment) of 08/23/2018

Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)

8/23/2018: Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)

Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration

6/8/2018: Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration

Certificate of Mailing for - [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration]

6/8/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration]

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/05/2018

6/5/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/05/2018

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

6/5/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

6/5/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

4/13/2018: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

3/27/2018: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/27/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

3/27/2018: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment) of 08/23/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration: Result: Denied; Result Date: 08/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment scheduled for 08/23/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6 updated: Result Date to 08/23/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketNotice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration; Filed by: Carlos FCO Canchola Ruiz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment scheduled for 08/23/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/05/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6 updated: Result Date to 06/05/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Gerianne Geraldette Brown against Defendant Carlos FCO Canchola Ruiz AKA Carlos Cancholos Appliances on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Gerianne Geraldette Brown on 03/27/2018 for the principal amount of $1,102.00 and costs of $80.00 for a total of $1,182.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/05/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Gerianne Geraldette Brown (Plaintiff); As to: Carlos FCO Canchola Ruiz (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 04/11/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Susan J. Townsend in Department 6 West Covina Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/05/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Gerianne Geraldette Brown (Plaintiff); As to: Carlos FCO Canchola Ruiz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less