This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/12/2021 at 12:05:07 (UTC).

GERALD CROSBY VS LENTON PROPERTIES INC.,

Case Summary

On 08/23/2017 GERALD CROSBY filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against LENTON PROPERTIES INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE LU. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0608

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CROSBY GERALD

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

LENTON PROPERTIES INC.

AMEY ENTERPRISE INC

Cross Defendant

LOS ANGELES REAL ESTATE INVESTORS CLUB LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEHRBAN MORSE

15720 Ventura Blvd, Suite 228

Encino, CA 91436

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

DRUCKER MICHAEL SCOTT

638 Lindero Cyn Rd # 260,

Oak Park, CA 91377

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/23/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

9/19/2017: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/4/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Related Case

12/13/2017: Notice of Related Case

Answer

12/13/2017: Answer

Cross-Complaint - of Amey Enterprise Inc.

12/13/2017: Cross-Complaint - of Amey Enterprise Inc.

Summons - on Cross Complaint

12/13/2017: Summons - on Cross Complaint

Minute Order - (Court Order) of 12/22/2017

12/22/2017: Minute Order - (Court Order) of 12/22/2017

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Court Order) of 12/22/2017

12/22/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Court Order) of 12/22/2017

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/27/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

4/15/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

2/27/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2/20/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

2/19/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 04/15/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 04/15/2019; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 04/15/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Pursuant to the Request for Dismissal filed by Amey Enterprise Inc on 02/19/2019, Roes ROES I through X, Inclusive and Los Angeles Real Estate Investors Club, LLC in Cross-Complaint filed by Amey Enterprise Inc on 12/13/2017 is dismissed without prejudice. Dismissal Disposition Type: Request for Dismissal - Before Trial not following ADR or more than 60 days since ADR; Filed Date changed from 02/19/2019 to 02/19/2019; Order Date: blank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Gerald Crosby (Plaintiff); As to: Lenton Properties Inc., (Defendant); Amey Enterprise Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Gerald Crosby on 08/23/2017, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Gerald Crosby as to Lenton Properties Inc., and Amey Enterprise Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/20/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 02/20/2019; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/20/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Amey Enterprise Inc (Cross-Complainant); As to: Los Angeles Real Estate Investors Club, LLC (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketDefault entered as to Amey Enterprise Inc; On the Complaint filed by Gerald Crosby on 08/23/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • DocketAddress for Morse Mehrban (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Morse Mehrban (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Gerald Crosby (Plaintiff); As to: Lenton Properties Inc., (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Gerald Crosby (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine Lu in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/20/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketOSC - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/26/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT -- LIMITED JURISDICTION

CENTRAL DISTRICT, STANLEY MOSK COURTHOUSE

GERALD CROSBY, CASE NO. 17STLC00608

Plaintiff, ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 77 —-— HON. ELAINE LU VS.

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF AMEY

LENTON PROPERTIES, INC.; ENTERPRISE INC. AMEY ENTERPRISE INC.; and

DOES 1 - 10 DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Defendants. ACTION FILED: August 23, 2017

TRIAL DATE: February 20, 2019 AMEY ENTERPRISE INC., a Cal- ifornia corporation, dba The Olympic Collection Banquet, Conference and Entertainment Center,

Cross-Complainant,

LOS ANGELES REAL ESTATE

INVESTORS CLUB, LLC; and ROES I through X, Inclusive,

Cross—-Defendants.

I T T T I /77

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMEY ENTERPRISE INC is a litigant

Latest cases where LENTON PROPERTIES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DRUCKER MICHAEL