This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2019 at 07:28:32 (UTC).

GERALD CROSBY VS LENTON PROPERTIES INC.,

Case Summary

On 08/23/2017 GERALD CROSBY filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against LENTON PROPERTIES INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE LU. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0607

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CROSBY GERALD

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

LENTON PROPERTIES INC.

AMEY ENTERPRISE INC

Cross Defendant

ZURIXX

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEHRBAN MORSE

Defendant Attorney

DRUCKER MICHAEL SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

2/19/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2/20/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

2/27/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

4/15/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

Notice (name extension) - of Court Order Re: Notice of Related Cases

1/12/2018: Notice (name extension) - of Court Order Re: Notice of Related Cases

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/27/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Cases)

12/22/2017: Minute Order - (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Cases)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Cases) of 12/22/2017

12/22/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Cases) of 12/22/2017

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Cases) of 12/22/2017

12/22/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Cases) of 12/22/2017

Summons - on Cross Complaint

12/14/2017: Summons - on Cross Complaint

Cross-Complaint - of Amey Enterprise Inc.

12/13/2017: Cross-Complaint - of Amey Enterprise Inc.

Answer

12/13/2017: Answer

Notice of Related Case

12/13/2017: Notice of Related Case

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

9/19/2017: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/23/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 04/15/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 04/15/2019; Result Type to Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 04/15/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/26/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Pursuant to the Request for Dismissal filed by Amey Enterprise Inc on 02/19/2019, Roes I through X, Inclusive and Zurixx in Cross-Complaint filed by Amey Enterprise Inc on 12/13/2017 is dismissed without prejudice. Dismissal Disposition Type: Request for Dismissal - Before Trial not following ADR or more than 60 days since ADR; Filed Date changed from 02/19/2019 to 02/19/2019; Order Date: blank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Gerald Crosby on 08/23/2017, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Gerald Crosby as to Amey Enterprise Inc and Lenton Properties Inc.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Gerald Crosby (Plaintiff); As to: Lenton Properties Inc., (Defendant); Amey Enterprise Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/20/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 02/20/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Amey Enterprise Inc (Cross-Complainant); As to: Zurixx (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2017
  • DocketCross-Complaint of Amey Enterprise Inc. Filed by: Amey Enterprise Inc (Cross-Complainant); As to: Zurixx (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • DocketAddress for Morse Mehrban (Attorney) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Morse Mehrban (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Gerald Crosby (Plaintiff); As to: Lenton Properties Inc., (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Gerald Crosby (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine Lu in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/20/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketOSC - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/26/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

MICHAEL S. DRUCKER FWLJE[) CA Bar No. 74338 Superior Court of California 638 Lindero Canyon Road ounty of Los Angeles Suite 260 Oak Park, California 91377-5457 DEC 13 2017

Sherri R. Qarter , : Tel/Fax: (818) 889-2930 By [Fioghve OficertClerk

Francisco Caldera Deputy

Attorneys for Defendant and Cross-Complainant, AMEY ENTERPRISE INC., a California corporation, dba The Olympic

Collection Banquet Conference

and Entertainment Center

LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT -- LIMITED JURISDICTION

CENTRAL DISTRICT, STANLEY MOSK COURTHOUSE

GERALD CROSBY, CASE NO. 17STLC00607

Plaintiff, ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 77 -— HON. ELAINE LU VS.

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF AMEY ENTERPRISE

LENTON PROPERTIES, INC.; INC. AMEY ENTERPRISE INC.; and

DOES 1 - 10 DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Defendants. ACTION FILED: August 23, 2017

TRIAL DATE: February 20, 2019 AMEY ENTERPRISE INC., a Cal- ifornia corporation, dba The Olympic Collection Banquet, Conference and Entertainment Center,

Cross-Complainant,

VS. ZURIXX, a business entity, form unknown; and ROES I

through X, Inclusive,

Cross—-Defendants.