This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/27/2019 at 01:31:19 (UTC).

GEORGE LIBERMAN ENTERPRISES IN VS CASTELLANOS, GLORIA

Case Summary

On 12/21/2015 GEORGE LIBERMAN ENTERPRISES IN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CASTELLANOS, GLORIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL SMALL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9158

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alhambra Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL SMALL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GEORGE LIBERMAN ENTERPRISES INC. DBA LEADERS SUPER STORE

Defendant

CASTELLANOS GLORIA

El Monte, CA 91731

Not Classified By Court and Assignee

ROGER`S ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

12/21/2015: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Fictitious Business Name (Small Claims)

12/21/2015: Fictitious Business Name (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

3/16/2016: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order

3/16/2016: Minute Order

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

3/17/2016: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)

3/21/2016: Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

4/26/2016: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

Certificate of Mailing for - [Order on Request for Court Order]

6/29/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - [Order on Request for Court Order]

Small Claims Settlement Agreement

8/26/2016: Small Claims Settlement Agreement

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 08/26/2016

8/26/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 08/26/2016

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

8/26/2016: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Declaration of Default in Payment of Judgment

2/23/2017: Declaration of Default in Payment of Judgment

Order on Declaration of Default in Payments

3/22/2017: Order on Declaration of Default in Payments

Certificate of Mailing for - [Request for Court Order and Answer]

7/13/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - [Request for Court Order and Answer]

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Hearing on Request for Court Order) of 10/05/2017

10/5/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Hearing on Request for Court Order) of 10/05/2017

Minute Order - (Hearing on Request for Court Order)

10/5/2017: Minute Order - (Hearing on Request for Court Order)

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

6/4/2018: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

6/8/2018: Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2018
  • Writ of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: Roger`s Acceptance Corporation (Assignee); As to: GLORIA CASTELLANOS (Defendant); Costs: 0.00; Interest: 173.45; Credits: 400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • Minute Order (Hearing on Request for Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Request for Court Order) of 10/05/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • Hearing on Request for Court Order scheduled for 10/05/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 10/05/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Armando Lopez; Filed by: (GEORGE LIBERMAN ENTERPRISES INC.) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • Order on Request for Court Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Roger`s Acceptance Corporation (Assignee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • Updated -- Request for Court Order and Answer: Result: Granted in Part; Result Date: 08/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • Hearing on Request for Court Order scheduled for 10/05/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2016
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPT. NE2 FOR CONSIDERATION RE: ORDER ON REQUEST TO MAKE PAYMENTS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: REQUEST TO MAKE PAYMENTS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • REQUEST TO PAY JUDGMENT IN INSTALLMENTS AND FINANCIAL DECLARATION FILED AS TO (CASTELLANOS, GLORIA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES, AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (CASTELLANOS, GLORIA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (GEORGE LIBERMAN ENTERPRISES INC.) DBA (LEADERS SUPER STORE) . KAREN ALVAREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 09:32A M, IN DEPT. NE2 , HON. MICHAEL SMALL, JUDGE PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (CASTELLANOS, GLORIA) BY SUB-SERVING FAVIOLA CASTELLANOS . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 03/16/16 AT 08:15A M, IN DEPT. NE2 COSTS OF $ 30.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN ALH256899021. HEARING SET FOR 03/16/16 AT 08:15 AM IN DPT. NE2.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • FICTITIOUS BUSINESS NAME DECLARATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.