This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/19/2018 at 21:32:40 (UTC).

GENNA, JOHN VS MORTON'S THE STEAKHOUSE

Case Summary

On 01/23/2013 GENNA, JOHN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MORTON'S THE STEAKHOUSE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MINA D. FRIED. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0395

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MINA D. FRIED

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GENNA JOHN

Defendant

MORTON'S THE STEAKHOUSE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2013
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. NWZ , HON. MINA D. FRIED, COMR. PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . DEFENDANT APPEARING .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 03/18/13 . FOR (GENNA, JOHN) . AGAINST (MORTON'S THE STEAKHOUSE) . PRINCIPAL $ 167.09 . COSTS $ 40.00 . TOTAL $ 207.09 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS. CONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 03/18/13 AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (MORTON'S THE STEAKHOUSE) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT FILED. SERVED AS TO (MORTON'S THE STEAKHOUSE) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2013
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT MAILED BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO DEFENDANT(S) (MORTON'S THE STEAKHOUSE) . RECEIPT # LAV522290007 . 7009 0960 0000 3926 1765

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2013
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # LAV522290006 . HEARING SET FOR 03/18/13 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. NWZ

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MORTON'S THE STEAKHOUSE is a litigant