This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/13/2019 at 11:51:38 (UTC).

GELB ENTERPRISES VS LEVI, ERAN

Case Summary

On 04/26/2017 GELB ENTERPRISES filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against LEVI, ERAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1686

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GELB ENTERPRISES

Defendants

EHRMANN MICHAEL

LEVI ERAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FELMAN EDWARD L

 

Court Documents

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

4/26/2017: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Complaint - Unlawful Detainer Commercial

4/26/2017: Complaint - Unlawful Detainer Commercial

Summons

4/26/2017: Summons

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction)

4/28/2017: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction)

Order - Dismissal

10/23/2017: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - (Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service)

10/23/2017: Minute Order - (Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service) of 10/23/2017

10/23/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service) of 10/23/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketOrder for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service) of 10/23/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/23/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department H updated: Result Date to 10/23/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • DocketOSC SET 10/23/17, 08:30 AM, DEPT. NWH PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - U.D. COMMERCIAL Filing Fee: 240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GELB Enterprises is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FELMAN EDWARD LUIS