This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/01/2021 at 00:45:32 (UTC).

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY VS STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, AND DOES 1 THROUGH 20, INCLUSIVE.

Case Summary

On 12/02/2020 GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, AND DOES 1 THROUGH 20, INCLUSIVE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3958

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Respondent

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY AND DOES 1 THROUGH 20 INCLUSIVE.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

AUL KATHERINE R.

Respondent Attorney

BALE HEATHER M.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 08/30/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketOn the Petition filed by GEICO General Insurance Company on 12/02/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by GEICO General Insurance Company as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketAddress for Katherine R. Aul (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 08/30/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketHearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award scheduled for 04/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: GEICO General Insurance Company (Petitioner); As to: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, and Does 1 through 20, Inclusive. (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Settlement: Status Date changed from 04/02/2021 to 04/02/2021; As To Parties: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, and Does 1 through 20, Inclusive. (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketReply to State Farm's Response to Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award; Filed by: GEICO General Insurance Company (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Sarah Knight; Filed by: GEICO General Insurance Company (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: GEICO General Insurance Company (Petitioner); As to: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, and Does 1 through 20, Inclusive. (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: GEICO General Insurance Company (Petitioner); As to: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, and Does 1 through 20, Inclusive. (Respondent); Service Date: 12/04/2020; Service Cost: 105.75; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketHearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award scheduled for 04/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketPetition to Confirm Arbitration Award; Filed by: GEICO General Insurance Company (Petitioner); As to: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, and Does 1 through 20, Inclusive. (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: GEICO General Insurance Company (Petitioner); As to: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, and Does 1 through 20, Inclusive. (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketSummons on Petition; Issued and Filed by: GEICO General Insurance Company (Petitioner); As to: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, and Does 1 through 20, Inclusive. (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STCP03958    Hearing Date: April 7, 2021    Dept: 25

HEARING DATE:   Wed., April 7, 2021 JUDGE /DEPT: Blancarte/25

CASE NAME Geico General Ins. Co. v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Ins. Co.

CASE NUMBER: 20STCP03958  PET. FILED: 12-02-20

NOTICE: OK

PROCEEDINGS    PETITION TO CONFIRM CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AWARD

MOVING PARTY:   Petitioner Geico General Insurance Company

RESP. PARTY: Respondent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

(CCP § 1285)

TENTATIVE RULING:

To allow the parties time to conclude their settlement efforts, the hearing on the Petition to Confirm Contractual Arbitration Award is CONTINUED TO MAY 26, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE.

SERVICE

[X] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) OK

[X] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) OK

[X] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) OK

OPPOSITION: Filed on December 16, 2020 [   ] Late [   ] None

REPLY: Filed on March 26, 2021 [   ] Late [   ] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background & Discussion

Petitioner Geico General Insurance Company (“Petitioner”) filed the instant Petition to Confirm Contractual Arbitration Award against Respondent State Farm Automobile Insurance Company (“Respondent”) on December 2, 2020. Respondent filed an Answer on December 16, 2020 and a Response to the Petition on March 23, 2021. Petitioner filed a Reply on March 26.

On April 2, 2021, Petitioner filed a Notice of Settlement of the Entire Case indicating the parties had reached a conditional settlement. (4/2/21 Notice of Settlement”). Thus, to allow the parties time to conclude their settlement efforts, this hearing is CONTINUED.

  1. Conclusion & Order

To allow the parties time to conclude their settlement efforts, the hearing on the Petition to Confirm Contractual Arbitration Award is CONTINUED TO MAY 26, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BALE HEATHER M. ESQ.