This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/27/2016 at 09:21:53 (UTC).

GAUCI, MELBA E. VS ZEWDE, SARA

Case Summary

On 03/15/2013 GAUCI, MELBA E filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ZEWDE, SARA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, San Pedro Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0276

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Pedro Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GAUCI MELBA E.

Defendant

ZEWDE SARA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GAUCI, MELBA E.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2013
  • RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION FILED BY THE SHERIFF'S. WRIT FULLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2013
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2013
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2013
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2013
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2013
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2013
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND NOT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • A/C - ATTORNEY UPDATE

    Read MoreRead Less