This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/18/2017 at 05:16:03 (UTC).

GATEWAY KW - ESPRIT ONE OWNER, VS. KING, RAY

Case Summary

On 05/05/2017 GATEWAY KW - ESPRIT ONE OWNER filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against KING, RAY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NORMAN P. TARLE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2031

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

NORMAN P. TARLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GATEWAY KW - ESPRIT ONE OWNER LLC

Defendants

PHILLIPS YAYOI AKA PHILLIPS YOI

KING RAY AKA KING RAYMOND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF HOLLENBECK & CARDOSO, LLP - TANIA K. CARDOSO ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF HOLLENBECK & CARDOSO, LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY CLERK FOR DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO (KING, RAY) AKA (KING, RAYMOND) , (PHILLIPS, YAYOI) AKA (PHILLIPS, YOI) AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS ON 05/18/17 FILED. DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 00.00 , AND DECLARATON OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 05/22/17 , FOR (GATEWAY KW - ESPRIT ONE OWNER, LLC) , AGAINST (KING, RAY) AKA (KING, RAYMOND) , (PHILLIPS, YAYOI) AKA (PHILLIPS, YOI) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 13924 MARQUESAS WAY, #2508 MARIAN DEL REY, CA 90292 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 144.67 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # PAID . BOX...

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLIANT/UD; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (KING, RAY) AKA (KING, RAYMOND) . COSTS OF $ 65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT/UD; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (PHILLIPS, YAYOI) AKA (PHILLIPS, YOI) . COSTS OF $ 65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP FILED. REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (KING, RAY) AKA (KING, RAYMOND) , (PHILLIPS, YAYOI) AKA (PHILLIPS, YOI) , AND AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS ON 05/18/17 . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RECEIPT # SM505588024

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 11/01/17 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. CLK . .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. WES , HONORABLE NORMAN P. TARLE .

    Read MoreRead Less